NY A06924 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-7)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for separate personal income tax credits for solar electric, solar thermal and wind energy systems installed upon any residence of a taxpayer.
Title
Provides for separate personal income tax credits for solar electric, solar thermal and wind energy systems installed upon any residence of a taxpayer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-15 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04708 (Same As) 2014-01-09 - PRINT NUMBER 4708A