NY A06959 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - signed chap.302
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - signed chap.302
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to giving public notice of meetings through electronic means; allows notice to be given by posting through electronic means or electronic transmission.
Title
Relates to giving public notice of meetings through electronic means; allows notice to be given by posting through electronic means or electronic transmission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-09 | Senate | signed chap.302 |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1711 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7958 |
2016-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.49 |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | rules report cal.49 |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | print number 6959a |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2016-02-10 | Assembly | reference changed to governmental operations |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07958 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6959A