NY A06971 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.486
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.486
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that buildings in which more than 50% of the habitable units are not subject to rent control are ineligible to apply for major capital investment rent surcharges.
Title
Provides that buildings in which more than 50% of the habitable units are not subject to rent control are ineligible to apply for major capital investment rent surcharges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.486 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.150 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.150 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S07926 (Same As) 2018-03-09 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT