NY A07018 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows employers to suspend a police officer without pay pending disciplinary charges.
Title
Allows employers to suspend a police officer without pay pending disciplinary charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Senate | tabled |
2014-11-21 | Senate | vetoed memo.490 |
2014-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-03 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.884 |
2014-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4824 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.537 |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | reported |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04824 (Same As) 2014-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7018