NY A07038 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-20 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-20 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "New York state healthy and green procurement act".
Title
Enacts the "New York state healthy and green procurement act".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2010-04-20 | delivered to senate | |
2010-04-20 | passed assembly | |
2010-02-01 | amended on third reading 7038a | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.465 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-05-05 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2009-05-05 | delivered to senate | |
2009-05-05 | passed assembly | |
2009-05-05 | ruling of chair on point of order | |
2009-04-30 | advanced to third reading cal.483 | |
2009-04-28 | reported | |
2009-04-20 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-03-18 | referred to governmental operations |