NY A07038 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - signed chap.252
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - signed chap.252
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes building inspectors, fire inspectors and code enforcement officers of the village of Buchanan, county of Westchester to live within Westchester county or an adjoining county.
Title
Authorizes building inspectors, fire inspectors and code enforcement officers of the village of Buchanan, county of Westchester to live within Westchester county or an adjoining county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Assembly | signed chap.252 |
2021-07-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1660 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6654B |
2021-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.135 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | rules report cal.135 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | print number 7038a |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06654 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7038A