NY A07067 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to aging
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to aging
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To create elder friendly communities in New York though the "New York certified retirement community act," and the program created under it, the "New York Livable Integrated Elder Friendly Retirement Communities (New York LIFE) program."
Title
Desig S301 to be Title 1, add Title head, Art 3 Title 2 SS310 - 318, Eld L Establishes the New York certified retirement community program within the office for the aging; such program provides for certification by the director of the office for the aging that a community is advantageous for retirees to live and that such community encourages retirees to reside therein; upon certification the office for the aging shall provide assistance to the community.
Sponsors
Asm. Ro Ann Destito [D] | Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Barbara Lifton [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] |
Asm. Audrey Pheffer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | referred to aging | |
2009-05-19 | print number 7067a | |
2009-05-19 | amend and recommit to ways and means | |
2009-05-19 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-03-19 | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S3147-A (Same As) 2010-04-19 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE