NY A07067 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - print number 7067a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to contingency planning by state agencies for extended federal government shutdowns; requires the secretary to oversee development of shutdown contingency plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to contingency planning by state agencies for extended federal government shutdowns; requires the secretary to oversee development of shutdown contingency plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08Assemblyprint number 7067a
2019-07-08Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-06-04Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-04-04Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S05452 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - PRINT NUMBER 5452A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback