NY A07072 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-19 - substituted by s3859a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-19 - substituted by s3859a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the New York state thruway authority to convey certain land located in the village of Canastota, county of Madison.
Title
Authorizes the New York state thruway authority to convey certain land located in the village of Canastota, county of Madison.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s3859a |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.445 |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.445 |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-06-07 | Assembly | print number 7072a |
2013-06-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S03859 (Same As) 2013-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.254