NY A07087 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-26 - print number 7087a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-26 - print number 7087a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts operators of law enforcement and fire department vessels from laws which regulate vessels on the navigable waters of the state while such operators are in the course of responding to emergencies.
Title
Exempts operators of law enforcement and fire department vessels from laws which regulate vessels on the navigable waters of the state while such operators are in the course of responding to emergencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | Assembly | print number 7087a |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S00387 (Same As) 2016-05-23 - referred to transportation