NY A07111 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-19 - substituted by s4867
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-19 - substituted by s4867
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits assessor of Nassau county to accept applications for exemptions from property taxes for property owned by the Westbury Water district.
Title
Permits assessor of Nassau county to accept applications for exemptions from property taxes for property owned by the Westbury Water district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s4867 |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.446 |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.446 |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S04867 (Same As) 2013-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.403