NY A07135 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-20 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-20 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of the office of children and family services to contract for a study evaluating the costs associated with child day care in various regulated settings.
Title
Directs the commissioner of the office of children and family services to contract for a study evaluating the costs associated with child day care in various regulated settings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-04-13 | Assembly | referred to children and families |