NY A07141 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-24 - print number 7141b
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-24 - print number 7141b
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the trustees of the state university of New York may authorize the establishment of a new category of tuition for non-resident students enrolled in distance learning courses.
Title
Provides that the trustees of the state university of New York may authorize the establishment of a new category of tuition for non-resident students enrolled in distance learning courses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-24 | Assembly | print number 7141b |
2014-01-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | print number 7141a |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S04597 (Same As) 2014-01-23 - PRINT NUMBER 4597B