NY A07172 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - signed chap.155
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - signed chap.155
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of provisions of law relating to permissible fees in connection with open end loans from June 30, 2023 until June 30, 2025.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of provisions of law relating to permissible fees in connection with open end loans from June 30, 2023 until June 30, 2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Assembly | signed chap.155 |
2023-06-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1252 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6920 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.284 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.284 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-12 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S06920 (Same As) 2023-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7172