NY A07209 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - substituted by s6943
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - substituted by s6943
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain powers of the New York state housing finance agency.
Title
Extends certain powers of the New York state housing finance agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Assembly | substituted by s6943 |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | rules report cal.605 |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S06943 (Same As) 2023-07-19 - SIGNED CHAP.205