NY A07219 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the issuance and display of a TNC driver identification card which includes such driver's name, photograph and license plate number, and additionally requires each TNC vehicle to display an illuminated sign indicating the TNC for which the TNC driver is providing the TNC service or TNC prearranged trip; requires rules to implement a machine-readable code or image.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the issuance and display of a TNC driver identification card which includes such driver's name, photograph and license plate number, and additionally requires each TNC vehicle to display an illuminated sign indicating the TNC for which the TNC driver is providing the TNC service or TNC prearranged trip; requires rules to implement a machine-readable code or image.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.504
2019-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.504
2019-06-18Assemblyreported
2019-06-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-11Assemblyprint number 7219c
2019-06-11Assemblyamend and recommit to transportation
2019-06-05Assemblyprint number 7219b
2019-06-05Assemblyamend and recommit to transportation
2019-05-16Assemblyprint number 7219a
2019-05-16Assemblyamend and recommit to transportation
2019-04-12Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S05536 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - PRINT NUMBER 5536C

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07219&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07219&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07219
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07219&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07219A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07219&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07219B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07219&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07219C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07219&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07219&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07219&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback