NY A07233 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a veterans' mental health and suicide prevention task force.
Title
Creates a veterans' mental health and suicide prevention task force.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | print number 7233a |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2017-04-12 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S04642 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS