NY A07253 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-16)
Status: Vetoed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-16 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-16 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To raise the visibility and public's awareness of libraries, and create an additional revenue source for funding of summer reading programs in libraries.
Title
Allows a taxpayer to elect to contribute a gift to the love your library fund on corporate and personal income tax return forms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-16 | tabled | |
2010-08-13 | vetoed memo.6754 | |
2010-08-03 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-16 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-16 | 3RD READING CAL.1024 | |
2010-06-16 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7551 | |
2010-04-28 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | |
2010-04-28 | delivered to senate | |
2010-04-28 | passed assembly | |
2010-03-17 | amended on third reading 7253a | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.484 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-06-18 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-16 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-16 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-16 | ordered to third reading rules cal.372 | |
2009-06-16 | rules report cal.372 | |
2009-06-16 | reported | |
2009-06-16 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-03-26 | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S4708 (Same As) 2010-03-16 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE