NY A07261 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - signed chap.382
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - signed chap.382
Summary
Limits adjusted homestead and non-homestead adjusted base proportions in assessing real estate taxes in the county of Nassau for the 2009 assessment roll.
Title
Limits adjusted homestead and non-homestead adjusted base proportions in assessing real estate taxes in the county of Nassau for the 2009 assessment roll.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-26 | signed chap.382 | |
2009-08-14 | delivered to governor | |
2009-07-16 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-07-16 | 3RD READING CAL.764 | |
2009-07-16 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3568A | |
2009-06-22 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-22 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-22 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-17 | amended on third reading 7261a | |
2009-06-16 | ordered to third reading rules cal.373 | |
2009-06-16 | rules report cal.373 | |
2009-06-16 | reported | |
2009-06-16 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-15 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-03-26 | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S03568 (Same As) 2009-08-26 - signed chap.382
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07261&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |