NY A07278 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the city of New Rochelle to impose an additional sales and compensating use tax.
Title
Extends the authority of the city of New Rochelle to impose an additional sales and compensating use tax.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.460 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S01976 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS