NY A07293 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the use of cool roofs on new construction or substantially renovated state-owned buildings; relates to establishing the state green building construction act.
Title
Authorizes the use of cool roofs on new construction or substantially renovated state-owned buildings; relates to establishing the state green building construction act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2010-06-29 | delivered to senate | |
2010-06-29 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-29 | ordered to third reading rules cal.432 | |
2010-06-29 | rules report cal.432 | |
2010-06-29 | reported | |
2010-06-25 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-05-17 | print number 7293c | |
2010-05-17 | amend and recommit to ways and means | |
2010-05-11 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-04-19 | print number 7293b | |
2010-04-19 | amend and recommit to energy | |
2010-01-06 | referred to energy | |
2009-06-22 | amended on third reading (t) 7293a | |
2009-06-22 | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading | |
2009-06-18 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-06-16 | recalled from senate | |
2009-05-11 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | |
2009-05-11 | delivered to senate | |
2009-05-11 | passed assembly | |
2009-05-07 | advanced to third reading cal.539 | |
2009-05-05 | reported | |
2009-04-21 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-03-27 | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S5038-A (Same As) 2010-05-19 - PRINT NUMBER 5038C