NY A07394 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the classification of transgender or intersex inmates; authorizes the chief administrative officer to assign a transgender or intersex inmate to any facility housing unit which shall ensure the inmate's health and safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the classification of transgender or intersex inmates; authorizes the chief administrative officer to assign a transgender or intersex inmate to any facility housing unit which shall ensure the inmate's health and safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-03Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-03Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.439
2019-05-21Assemblyreported
2019-05-01Assemblyreferred to correction

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback