NY A07408 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - signed chap.164
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - signed chap.164
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions relating to period of probable usefulness of certain judgments, compromised claims or settled claims until June 15, 2028.
Title
Extends provisions relating to period of probable usefulness of certain judgments, compromised claims or settled claims until June 15, 2028.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Assembly | signed chap.164 |
2023-06-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-05 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1413 |
2023-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7080 |
2023-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.420 |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | rules report cal.420 |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07080 (Same As) 2023-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7408