NY A07455 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - held for consideration in transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - held for consideration in transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a plea of guilty and the payment of fines or penalties electronically via the internet.
Title
Authorizes a plea of guilty and the payment of fines or penalties electronically via the internet.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Assembly | held for consideration in transportation |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | print number 7455a |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05567 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES