NY A07457 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the undertaking required of tobacco manufacturers and affiliates during appeals of the tobacco master settlement agreement to $100,000,000 for all appellants collectively, unless the appellee proves by a preponderance of the evidence that the appellant is dissipating assets outside the course of normal business.
Title
Limits the undertaking required of tobacco manufacturers and affiliates during appeals of the tobacco master settlement agreement to $100,000,000 for all appellants collectively, unless the appellee proves by a preponderance of the evidence that the appellant is dissipating assets outside the course of normal business.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | print number 7457a |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2011-05-04 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05108 (Same As) 2012-06-12 - referred to judiciary