NY A07461 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - signed chap.439
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - signed chap.439
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to inheritance by children conceived after the death of a genetic parent.
Title
Relates to inheritance by children conceived after the death of a genetic parent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Senate | signed chap.439 |
2014-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.192 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4779B |
2014-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-02-10 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7461a |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.365 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.162 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.162 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04779 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7461A