NY A07500 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - print number 7500a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - print number 7500a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of education to develop guidelines to encourage those in high school to participate in apprenticeships and to raise awareness in apprenticeship opportunities.
Title
Requires the commissioner of education to develop guidelines to encourage those in high school to participate in apprenticeships and to raise awareness in apprenticeship opportunities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Assembly | print number 7500a |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-04-28 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S02124 (Same As) 2018-05-02 - referred to education