NY A07504 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reporting unmet need, which is the number of eligible individuals seeking participation in a program or service who are not receiving such program or service due to insufficient resources or capacity.
Title
Relates to reporting unmet need, which is the number of eligible individuals seeking participation in a program or service who are not receiving such program or service due to insufficient resources or capacity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.273 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.554 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S06586 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO AGING