NY A07559 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5429c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5429c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Southeast, in the county of Putnam to issue $380,000 in serial bonds for extraordinary expenses incurred when the Springhouse water district source of water was declared unsafe.
Title
Authorizes the town of Southeast, in the county of Putnam to issue $380,000 in serial bonds for extraordinary expenses incurred when the Springhouse water district source of water was declared unsafe.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Katz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s5429c |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.569 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.569 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | print number 7559d |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | print number 7559c |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | print number 7559b |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | print number 7559a |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05429 (Same As) 2015-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.504