NY A07562 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s5754a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s5754a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the metropolitan transportation authority and New York city transit authority to study and report on the aboveground transit infrastructure of the metropolitan transit authority.
Title
Directs the metropolitan transportation authority and New York city transit authority to study and report on the aboveground transit infrastructure of the metropolitan transit authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5754a |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.503 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.503 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | print number 7562a |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S05754 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - APPROVAL MEMO.58