NY A07582 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s6706b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s6706b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the eligibility of certain families with incomes up to eighty-five percent of state median income to receive child care assistance.
Title
Relates to the eligibility of certain families with incomes up to eighty-five percent of state median income to receive child care assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s6706b |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.771 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | print number 7582a |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-14 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S06706 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES