NY A07627 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s6336
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s6336
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants Blake Russell additional service credit with the New York state and local police and fire retirement system.
Title
Grants Blake Russell additional service credit with the New York state and local police and fire retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s6336 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.776 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06336 (Same As) 2021-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.539