NY A07628 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-12 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-12 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the animal dealers that are exempt under the provisions of article 7 of the agriculture and markets law relating to the licensing, identification and control of dogs; applies provisions to dealers licensed as a class A dealer under the Federal Animal Welfare Act that sells dogs exclusively to USDA registered research facilities; requires a certificate of exemption.
Title
Limits the animal dealers that are exempt under the provisions of article 7 of the agriculture and markets law relating to the licensing, identification and control of dogs; applies provisions to dealers licensed as a class A dealer under the Federal Animal Welfare Act that sells dogs exclusively to USDA registered research facilities; requires a certificate of exemption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2011-05-11 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S06218 (Same As) 2012-01-13 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE