NY A07641 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-12 - substituted by s5212a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-12 - substituted by s5212a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to sprinkler system notice in residential leases.
Title
Relates to sprinkler system notice in residential leases.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael DenDekker [D] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Asm. Kevin Cahill [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Asm. William Colton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | Assembly | substituted by s5212a |
2014-02-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.443 |
2014-02-04 | Assembly | reported |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.549 |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.549 |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-07 | Assembly | print number 7641a |
2013-06-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05212 (Same As) 2014-08-05 - SIGNED CHAP.202