NY A07676 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.287
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.287
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the manner in which certain provisions of the correction law are enforced.
Title
Relates to the manner in which certain provisions of the correction law are enforced.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.287 |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.464 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S02193 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION