NY A07686 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-12 - reference changed to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-12 - reference changed to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Knickerbocker Greys program to access and use for a permanent headquarters the seventh regiment armory for the purposes of programming during periods which are not periods of civil or military emergency.
Title
Authorizes the Knickerbocker Greys program to access and use for a permanent headquarters the seventh regiment armory for the purposes of programming during periods which are not periods of civil or military emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-12 | Assembly | reference changed to governmental operations |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07212 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS