NY A07691 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.233
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.233
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to fix open season and bag limits for pheasant hunting on Long Island by individuals who hold a junior license.
Title
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to fix open season and bag limits for pheasant hunting on Long Island by individuals who hold a junior license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.233 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.185 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | substituted for a7691 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1270 |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s6350 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.185 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.185 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06350 (Same As) 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.233