NY A07705 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to enacting the "community financial services access and modernization act of 2017"; modernizes existing statute to reflect the full scope of financial services available at neighborhood "check cashing" establishments; provides for a comprehensive regulatory framework for the delivery of the expanded financial services currently being offered.
Title
Relates to enacting the "community financial services access and modernization act of 2017"; modernizes existing statute to reflect the full scope of financial services available at neighborhood "check cashing" establishments; provides for a comprehensive regulatory framework for the delivery of the expanded financial services currently being offered.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | print number 7705b |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | print number 7705a |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to banks |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S05920 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO BANKS