NY A07711 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates the manufacture, sale and use of shipping pallets, recycled and new, that contain decabromodiphenyl ether.
Title
Regulates the manufacture, sale and use of shipping pallets, recycled and new, that contain decabromodiphenyl ether.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.145 |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.145 |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 7711a |
2011-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05391 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION