NY A07714 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.377
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.377
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to transitional aid for Tier 4 eligible school districts.
Title
Relates to transitional aid for Tier 4 eligible school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.377 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.376 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.376 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | referred to education |