NY A07734 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - print number 7734a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - print number 7734a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Frank Smith, a New York city police detective, to receive accidental performance of duty disability retirement benefits for illness suffered as a result of exposure to disease during undercover assignments as a member of the police department of the city of New York.
Title
Authorizes Frank Smith, a New York city police detective, to receive accidental performance of duty disability retirement benefits for illness suffered as a result of exposure to disease during undercover assignments as a member of the police department of the city of New York.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Assembly | print number 7734a |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07407 (Same As) 2024-03-04 - PRINT NUMBER 7407A