NY A07739 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - advanced to third reading cal.998
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - advanced to third reading cal.998
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to regulation of toxic chemicals in pet products; establishes the interstate chemical clearinghouse.
Title
Relates to regulation of toxic chemicals in pet products; establishes the interstate chemical clearinghouse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.998 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07660 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION