NY A07739 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the ethics commission of the unified court system to post each state-paid judge's annual financial disclosures on the ethics commission's public website for five years beginning with filings made on January 1, 2018.
Title
Requires the ethics commission of the unified court system to post each state-paid judge's annual financial disclosures on the ethics commission's public website for five years beginning with filings made on January 1, 2018.
Sponsors
Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Christopher Burdick [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. Gina Sillitti [D] |
Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] | Asm. Maritza Davila [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S01571 (Same As) 2024-03-14 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING