NY A07750 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-11 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-11 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the provision of school age child care in school buildings shall primarily be subject to the regulations of the commissioner of education.
Title
Provides that the provision of school age child care in school buildings shall primarily be subject to the regulations of the commissioner of education.
Sponsors
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Asm. Nily Rozic [D] |
Asm. Barbara Clark [D] | Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] | Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] | Asm. Peter Lopez [R] |
Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-11 | Senate | tabled |
2015-12-11 | Senate | vetoed memo.286 |
2015-11-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5627 |
2015-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.175 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.175 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | reference changed to children and families |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05627 (Same As) 2015-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7750