NY A07756 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s7542
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s7542
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to transfer and convey certain unappropriated state land to the town of Romulus for the purposes of operating and maintaining a water treatment plant.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to transfer and convey certain unappropriated state land to the town of Romulus for the purposes of operating and maintaining a water treatment plant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s7542 |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.849 |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07542 (Same As) 2023-12-08 - APPROVAL MEMO.54