NY A07764 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands requirements relating to the development and operation of a data match system to facilitate the identification and seizure of non-exempt financial assets of tax debtors.
Title
Expands requirements relating to the development and operation of a data match system to facilitate the identification and seizure of non-exempt financial assets of tax debtors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | Senate | signed chap.380 |
2012-08-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1086 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5461 |
2012-02-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2012-02-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-02-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.260 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.149 |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.149 |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05461 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7764