NY A07765 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - signed chap.530
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - signed chap.530
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to definitions pertaining to net energy metering standards for non-residential customers.
Title
Relates to definitions pertaining to net energy metering standards for non-residential customers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-23 | Senate | signed chap.530 |
2011-09-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1074 |
2011-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5443A |
2011-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7765a |
2011-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.491 |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S05443 (Same As) 2011-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7765A