NY A07792 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to hotel or motel taxes in the county of Oswego; provides that campgrounds shall only be subject to such tax for rentals of spaces that include cabins or trailers furnished by the campground as part of the rental.
Title
Relates to hotel or motel taxes in the county of Oswego; provides that campgrounds shall only be subject to such tax for rentals of spaces that include cabins or trailers furnished by the campground as part of the rental.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | home rule request |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.609 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.609 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | print number 7792a |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06432 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS