NY A07797 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Implements the empire propane education and research act; authorizes the creation of certain propane education programs; requires the creation of an empire propane education and research council; enumerates the duties and purposes of the empire propane education and research council.
Title
Implements the empire propane education and research act; authorizes the creation of certain propane education programs; requires the creation of an empire propane education and research council; enumerates the duties and purposes of the empire propane education and research council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | reported referred to codes | |
2010-01-06 | referred to energy | |
2009-05-27 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-04-24 | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S07883 (Same As) 2010-06-08 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE