NY A07799 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides consumers the option to elect not to use transmitting utility meters and provides that the commission shall not charge a fee to consumers making such election.
Title
Provides consumers the option to elect not to use transmitting utility meters and provides that the commission shall not charge a fee to consumers making such election.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2013-11-04 | Assembly | print number 7799a |
2013-11-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to energy |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S03379 (Same As) 2014-02-27 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE